Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Suarez, Victor Omar, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Suarez, Martha Constanza, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with KHOUZAM, NELLY N presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKHOUZAM, NELLY N Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 28, 2005 |
CategoryDissolution Of Marriage |
Last RefreshedDecember 27, 2020 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 16, 2006 | Docket Event |
CERTIFIED STATEMENT COMPLETED BY CLERK Comment: CERTIFIED STATEMENT COMPLETED BY CLERK; VER: N; K
Judge: KHOUZAM, NELLY N |
|
May 08, 2006 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Comment: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM; VER: F; P
Judge: KHOUZAM, NELLY N |
|
May 08, 2006 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT Comment: FINAL JUDGMENT OR15102PG1442-002; VER: F; P Vol./Book 15102, Page 1442, 002 pages
Judge: KHOUZAM, NELLY N |
|
May 08, 2006 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT (SRS) Comment: JUDGMENT; VER: N; P
Judge: KHOUZAM, NELLY N |
|
May 08, 2006 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT Comment: EXHIBIT 1 COPY DL; VER: F; D
Judge: KHOUZAM, NELLY N |
|
March 08, 2006 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING Comment: NOTICE OF HEARING 050806 AT 10:30 (FINAL); VER: F; P
Judge: KHOUZAM, NELLY N |
|
February 24, 2006 | Docket Event |
ORDER APPROVING ATTACHED MEDIATED STIPULATION Comment: ORDER APPROVING ATTA MEDIATED STIPULATION; VER: F; P
Judge: KHOUZAM, NELLY N |
|
February 23, 2006 | Docket Event |
NOTICE FINAL DISPO OF FAMILY MEDIATION Comment: NOTICE FINAL DISPO OF FAMILY MEDIATION /SETTLED W/AGREEMENT; VER: F; P
Judge: KHOUZAM, NELLY N |
|
February 16, 2006 | Docket Event |
Mediation - Fee Paid $ Comment: MED FEE PAID VICTOR OMAR SUAREZ; VER: N; P
Judge: KHOUZAM, NELLY N |
|
February 16, 2006 | Docket Event |
Mediation - Fee Paid $ Comment: MED FEE PAID MARTHA CONSTANZA SUAREZ; VER: N; D
Judge: KHOUZAM, NELLY N |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.