Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Padua, Flor Avorque, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Padua, Cesar F, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with ANDREWS, MICHAEL F presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeANDREWS, MICHAEL F Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 28, 2005 |
CategoryDissolution Of Marriage |
Last RefreshedDecember 25, 2020 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 15, 2006 | Docket Event |
CERTIFIED STATEMENT COMPLETED BY CLERK Comment: CERTIFIED STATEMENT COMPLETED BY CLERK; VER: N; K
Judge: ANDREWS, MICHAEL F |
|
February 02, 2006 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Comment: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM; VER: F; P
Judge: ANDREWS, MICHAEL F |
|
February 02, 2006 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT Comment: FINAL JUDGMENT OR14911PG0563-001; VER: F; P Vol./Book 14911, Page 0563, 001 pages
Judge: ANDREWS, MICHAEL F |
|
February 02, 2006 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT (SRS) Comment: JUDGMENT; VER: N; P
Judge: ANDREWS, MICHAEL F |
|
February 02, 2006 | Docket Event |
RECOMMENDATION OF GENERAL MAGISTRATE Comment: RECOMMEND OF GENER. MAGISTRATE; VER: F; P
Judge: ANDREWS, MICHAEL F |
|
December 20, 2005 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING Comment: NOTICE OF HEARING 013106 11:00; VER: F; P
Judge: ANDREWS, MICHAEL F |
|
December 13, 2005 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF REFERENCE TO GENERAL MAGISTRATE Comment: ORDER OF REFERENCE TO GENERAL MASTER; VER: F; P
Judge: ANDREWS, MICHAEL F |
|
December 07, 2005 | Docket Event |
DISCLOSURE FROM NON-LAWYER Comment: DISCLOSURE FROM NON-LAWYER; VER: F; P
Judge: ANDREWS, MICHAEL F |
|
December 07, 2005 | Docket Event |
DISCLOSURE FROM NON-LAWYER Comment: DISCLOSURE FROM NON-LAWYER; VER: F; D
Judge: ANDREWS, MICHAEL F |
|
December 07, 2005 | Docket Event |
ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF Comment: ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF: FROM EMBASSY OF THE PHILIPPINES(2; VER: F; D
Judge: ANDREWS, MICHAEL F |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.