Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
1338 Browning Trust Wyoming Indian Trust Services, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by John E Mcmillan, Esq, against Carow, Donna, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with VACCARO, DOROTHY presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeVACCARO, DOROTHY Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 12, 2005 |
CategoryDelinquent Tenant - County |
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 30, 2005 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION Comment: WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO ATTY (MLD); VER: N; K
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
December 29, 2005 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT Comment: FINAL JUDGMENT FOR EVICTION OR14842PG1038-001; VER: F; P Vol./Book 14842, Page 1038, 001 pages
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
December 29, 2005 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT JUDGMENT (SRS DISPO) Comment: DEFAULT JUDGMENT; VER: N; P
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
December 28, 2005 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT ENTERED Comment: DEFAULT ENTERED COUNT I; VER: F; K
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
December 27, 2005 | Docket Event |
VERIFICATION OF CLAIM AND NON-MILITARY SERVICE Comment: VERIFIC. OF CLAIM AND NON-MILITARY SERV; VER: F; P
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
December 27, 2005 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT Comment: MOTION FOR DEFAULT; VER: F; P
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
December 15, 2005 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS SERVED - POSTED Comment: SUMMONS RETD SERVED/POSTED DONNA CAROW 121205; VER: F; K
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
December 12, 2005 | Docket Event |
County Civil Filing - Fee Paid $ Comment: COUNTY CIVIL FILING FEE PAID $80.00; VER: N; P
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
December 12, 2005 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF MAILING Comment: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; VER: F; K
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
December 12, 2005 | Docket Event |
THIS CASE ASSIGNED BY CLERK TO SECTION Comment: THIS CASE ASSIGNED BY CLERK TO SECTION 042 BY 7353 - RANDOM CO; VER: N; P
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.