Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Robert A Smith, Jr, against Watkins, Danielle M, Watkins Danielle M Pr, Unknown Tenant No 2, Unknown Tenant No 1, Herl, Maxine R, (total of 8) See All represented by Theo J Karaphillis, Esq, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with BOYER, BRUCE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBOYER, BRUCE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2005 |
CategoryMortgage Foreclosure - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 01, 2006 | Docket Event |
COPY CORRESPONDENCE FROM CLERK RE Comment: COPY CORRESPONDENCE FROM CLERK RE: RECORDING FEE; VER: F; K
Judge: BOYER, BRUCE |
|
April 24, 2006 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Comment: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM; VER: F; P
Judge: BOYER, BRUCE |
|
April 24, 2006 | Docket Event |
Lis Pendens Recording - Fee Paid $ Comment: LIS PENDENS RECORDING FEE PAID - $10.00; VER: N; P
Judge: BOYER, BRUCE |
|
April 24, 2006 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Comment: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/OUT PREJUDICE/; VER: N; P
Judge: BOYER, BRUCE |
|
April 24, 2006 | Docket Event |
DISCHARGE OF LIS PENDENS Comment: DISCHARGE OF LIS PENDENS OR15079PG1032-002; VER: F; P Vol./Book 15079, Page 1032, 002 pages
Judge: BOYER, BRUCE |
|
April 24, 2006 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) Comment: CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING; VER: N; P
Judge: BOYER, BRUCE |
|
March 30, 2006 | Docket Event |
ATTORNEY COVER LETTER Comment: ATTORNEY COVER LETTER RCVD BY COURT 032106; VER: F; D
Judge: BOYER, BRUCE |
|
March 30, 2006 | Docket Event |
ORDER DENYING Comment: ORDER DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS BY MORRIS KLEIMAN; VER: F; D
Judge: BOYER, BRUCE |
|
March 08, 2006 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING Comment: NOTICE OF HEARING 032206 9:00; VER: F; P
Judge: BOYER, BRUCE |
|
February 17, 2006 | Docket Event |
PUBLISHER'S AFFIDAVIT Comment: PUBLISHER'S AFFIDAVIT 30 DAYS; VER: F; K
Judge: BOYER, BRUCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.