Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Messer, Andrew C, filed a(n) Judgment Enforcement - Creditor case against Messer, Katherine, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with BOYER, BRUCE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBOYER, BRUCE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2005 |
CategoryForeign Judgment - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeJudgment Enforcement |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 18, 2013 | Docket Event |
REOPEN - CLOSED
Judge: BOYER, BRUCE |
|
June 19, 2006 | Docket Event |
(((((FILE VERIFIED TO THIS DATE))))) Comment: (((((FILE VERIFIED/SEALED THIS DATE))))) SBM; VER: N; K
Judge: BOYER, BRUCE |
|
June 16, 2006 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY Comment: NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL; VER: F; D
Judge: BOYER, BRUCE |
|
June 13, 2006 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION Comment: MOTION /ORDER TRANSFERRING TO FAMILY DIVISION; VER: F; P
Judge: BOYER, BRUCE |
|
June 12, 2006 | Docket Event |
ACCEPTANCE Comment: ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE 060906; VER: F; P
Judge: BOYER, BRUCE |
|
June 09, 2006 | Docket Event |
THIS CASE ASSIGNED BY CLERK TO SECTION Comment: CASE ASSIGNED SECTION 007 FROM SECTION HNO BY 5347 - RANDOM N A; VER: N; P
Judge: BOYER, BRUCE |
|
May 23, 2006 | Docket Event |
PETITION MODIFY-SUPPLEMENT FINAL JUDGMENT Comment: PETITION MODIFY/SUPPLEMENT FINAL JUDGMENT; VER: F; D
Judge: BOYER, BRUCE |
|
May 23, 2006 | Docket Event |
RESPONDENT'S FINANCIAL STATEMENT-AFFIDAVIT Comment: FINANCIAL STATEMENT/AFFIDAVIT; VER: F; D
Judge: BOYER, BRUCE |
|
May 23, 2006 | Docket Event |
REOPEN CASE-MODIFICATION Comment: REOPEN CASE/MODIFICATION; VER: N; D
Judge: BOYER, BRUCE |
|
May 23, 2006 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR CONTEMPT Comment: MOTION CONTEMPT; VER: F; D
Judge: BOYER, BRUCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.