Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Rucco, Michael, Iii, filed a(n) Judgment Enforcement - Creditor case represented by K Dean Kantaras, Esq, against Ermert, Amanda, represented by Tristan W Sanders, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with BOYER, BRUCE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBOYER, BRUCE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 28, 2005 |
CategoryForeign Judgment - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeJudgment Enforcement |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 18, 2013 | Docket Event |
REOPEN - CLOSED
Judge: BOYER, BRUCE |
|
August 02, 2006 | Docket Event |
(((((FILE VERIFIED TO THIS DATE))))) Comment: (((((FILE VERIFIED/SEALED THIS DATE))))) SBM; VER: N; K
Judge: BOYER, BRUCE |
|
August 01, 2006 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION Comment: MOTION / ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO FAMILY DIVISION; VER: F; P
Judge: BOYER, BRUCE |
|
April 27, 2006 | Docket Event |
AMENDED Comment: AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL PETITION FOR MODIFICATION; VER: F; P
Judge: BOYER, BRUCE |
|
April 10, 2006 | Docket Event |
CASE REOPENED Comment: REOPEN CASE/OTHER; VER: N; D
Judge: BOYER, BRUCE |
|
April 10, 2006 | Docket Event |
DEF-RESP'S MOTION Comment: MOTION TO STAY/TO DISMISS; VER: F; D
Judge: BOYER, BRUCE |
|
April 06, 2006 | Docket Event |
THIS CASE ASSIGNED BY CLERK TO SECTION Comment: CASE ASSIGNED SECTION 007 FROM SECTION HNO BY 5347 - RANDOM N A; VER: N; P
Judge: BOYER, BRUCE |
|
April 05, 2006 | Docket Event |
DEF-RESP'S MOTION Comment: MOTION TO STAY/MOTION TO DISMISS/FAXED COPY; VER: F; D
Judge: BOYER, BRUCE |
|
March 28, 2006 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS - SERVED Comment: SUMMONS RETD SERVED AMANDA ERMERT 031806; VER: F; K
Judge: BOYER, BRUCE |
|
February 14, 2006 | Docket Event |
PETITIONER'S FINANCIAL STATEMENT-AFFIDAVIT Comment: FINANCIAL STATEMENT/AFFIDAVIT; VER: F; P
Judge: BOYER, BRUCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.