Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
U S Bank N A, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Stuart H Gitlitz, against Floro, Elio A, Floro, Laura C, Seaside Estates Homeowners Association Inc, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with QUESADA, FRANK presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeQUESADA, FRANK Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 28, 2005 |
CategoryMortgage Foreclosure - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 08, 2007 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE Comment: CERTIFICATE OF TITLE RETD BY PO; VER: F; D
Judge: QUESADA, FRANK |
|
January 31, 2007 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE TITLE MLD PLTF(S) ATTORNEY Comment: CERTIFICATE TITLE MLD PLTF(S) ATTORNEY; VER: N; K
Judge: QUESADA, FRANK |
|
January 29, 2007 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF TITLE Comment: CERTIFICATE OF TITLE RECORDED: OR15607PG2324-002; VER: R; K Vol./Book 15607, Page 2324, 002 pages
Judge: QUESADA, FRANK |
|
January 29, 2007 | Docket Event |
Doc Stamps - Fee Paid $ Comment: DOC STAMPS - FEE PAID $.70; VER: N; P
Judge: QUESADA, FRANK |
|
January 29, 2007 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF NO DISBURSEMENT Comment: CERTIFICATE OF NO DISBURSEMENT; VER: F; K
Judge: QUESADA, FRANK |
|
January 16, 2007 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF SALE Comment: CERTIFICATE OF SALE US BANK; VER: F; P
Judge: QUESADA, FRANK |
|
January 16, 2007 | Docket Event |
PUBLISHER'S AFFIDAVIT NOTICE OF SALE Comment: PUBLISHERS AFFIDAVIT NOTICE OF SALE; VER: F; P
Judge: QUESADA, FRANK |
|
January 16, 2007 | Docket Event |
Certificate Of Sale - Fee Paid $70.00 Comment: CERTIFICATE OF SALE - FEE PAID $60.00; VER: N; P
Judge: QUESADA, FRANK |
|
December 15, 2006 | Docket Event |
Notice Of Sale/Copy To Gulf Coast Bus Rev Comment: NOTICE OF SALE/COPY TO GULF COAST BUS REV; VER: F; K
Judge: QUESADA, FRANK |
|
December 14, 2006 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING Comment: NOTICE OF FILING ORIGNAL NOTE/ASSIGNMENT/MORTGAGE; VER: F; P
Judge: QUESADA, FRANK |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.