Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Bozzuto, Ella Mae, filed a(n) General Negligence - Torts case represented by Brian L Barker, against Publix Super Markets Inc, represented by Kerry H Brown, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with RONDOLINO, ANTHONY presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRONDOLINO, ANTHONY Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 16, 2005 |
CategoryNegligence - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Negligence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 20, 2013 | Docket Event |
REOPEN - CLOSED
Judge: RONDOLINO, ANTHONY |
|
July 08, 2008 | Docket Event |
EVIDENCE DESTROYED Comment: PLTF & DEFT EVIDENCE DESTROYED; VER: N; K
Judge: RONDOLINO, ANTHONY |
|
July 08, 2008 | Docket Event | EVIDENCE DESTROYEDComment: PLTF & DEFT EVIDENCE DESTROYED; VER: N; K | |
May 19, 2008 | Docket Event |
INTENT TO DESTROY EVIDENCE Comment: INTENT TO DESTROY EVIDENCE SENT TO PLTF & DEFT ATTYS; VER: F; K
Judge: RONDOLINO, ANTHONY |
|
May 19, 2008 | Docket Event | INTENT TO DESTROY EVIDENCEComment: INTENT TO DESTROY EVIDENCE SENT TO PLTF & DEFT ATTYS; VER: F; K | |
March 01, 2007 | Docket Event |
Recording Of Judgment Lien - Fee Paid $ Comment: RECORDING OF JDMT LIEN - FEE PAID $10.00; VER: N; P
Judge: RONDOLINO, ANTHONY |
|
March 01, 2007 | Docket Event | Recording Of Judgment Lien - Fee Paid $Comment: RECORDING OF JDMT LIEN - FEE PAID $10.00; VER: N; P | |
February 28, 2007 | Docket Event |
PRAECIPE FOR RECORDATION OF JDMT AS LIEN Comment: PRAECIPE FOR RECORDATION OF JDMT AS LIEN; VER: F; P
Judge: RONDOLINO, ANTHONY |
|
February 28, 2007 | Docket Event |
CC JUDGMENT MADE-HANDED RECORDING Comment: C/C JUDGEMENT MADE/HANDED RECORDING OR15660PG1089-001; VER: R; K Vol./Book 15660, Page 1089, 001 pages
Judge: RONDOLINO, ANTHONY |
|
February 28, 2007 | Docket Event | PRAECIPE FOR RECORDATION OF JDMT AS LIENComment: PRAECIPE FOR RECORDATION OF JDMT AS LIEN; VER: F; P |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.