Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Bank Of New York, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Billie K Pollack, against Unknown Spouse Heirs Devisees, Myer, Jonathan, Myer, Edwin, Department Of Revenue State Of Flordia, Citibank Federal Savings Bank, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with SHAMES, MARK I presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSHAMES, MARK I Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 01, 1900 |
CategoryMortgage Foreclosure - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 19, 2013 | Docket Event |
REOPEN - CLOSED
Judge: SHAMES, MARK I |
|
November 16, 2006 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION Comment: WRIT OF POSSESSION RETD EXECUTED; VER: F; K
Judge: SHAMES, MARK I |
|
November 01, 2006 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION Comment: WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO SHERIFF; VER: N; K
Judge: SHAMES, MARK I |
|
October 31, 2006 | Docket Event |
ORDER Comment: ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO ISSUE WRIT OF POSOR15454PG0740-002; VER: F; P Vol./Book 15454, Page 0740, 002 pages
Judge: SHAMES, MARK I |
|
October 27, 2006 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION RECEIVED Comment: WRIT OF POSSESSION RECEIVED W/CHECK; VER: N; P
Judge: SHAMES, MARK I |
|
October 25, 2006 | Docket Event |
Reopen Fee Paid $ Comment: RE-OPEN FEE PAID - $50.00; VER: N; P
Judge: SHAMES, MARK I |
|
October 24, 2006 | Docket Event |
CASE REOPENED Comment: REOPEN CASE/OTHER; VER: N; P
Judge: SHAMES, MARK I |
|
October 24, 2006 | Docket Event |
EX-PARTE MOTION Comment: EX-PARTE MOTION: DIRECTING CLERK TO ISSUE WRIT POSSESSION; VER: F; P
Judge: SHAMES, MARK I |
|
September 26, 2006 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE TITLE MLD PLTF(S) ATTORNEY Comment: CERTIFICATE TITLE MLD PLTF(S) ATTORNEY; VER: N; K
Judge: SHAMES, MARK I |
|
September 22, 2006 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF TITLE Comment: CERTIFICATE OF TITLE RECORDED: OR15381PG2218-001; VER: R; K Vol./Book 15381, Page 2218, 001 pages
Judge: SHAMES, MARK I |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.