Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Wells Fargo Bank Na, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Robert A Smith, Jr, against Unknown Tenant No 2, Unknown Tenant No 1, Salazar, Maria, Salazar, Felipe, Homeowners Service Of Tampa Inc, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with DOWNEY, BRANDT C, III presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDOWNEY, BRANDT C, III Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 01, 1900 |
CategoryMortgage Foreclosure - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 02, 2006 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION Comment: WRIT OF POSSESSION RETD EXECUTED; VER: F; K
Judge: DOWNEY, BRANDT C, III |
|
April 11, 2006 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION Comment: WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO SHERIFF RESENT 041206; VER: F; K
Judge: DOWNEY, BRANDT C, III |
|
March 27, 2006 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF TITLE Comment: CERTIFICATE OF TITLE MLD TOPLTF ATTY; VER: F; K
Judge: DOWNEY, BRANDT C, III |
|
March 24, 2006 | Docket Event |
Doc Stamps - Fee Paid $ Comment: DOC STAMPS - FEE PAID $.70; VER: N; P
Judge: DOWNEY, BRANDT C, III |
|
March 24, 2006 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF NO DISBURSEMENT Comment: CERTIFICATE OF NO DISBURSEMENT; VER: F; K
Judge: DOWNEY, BRANDT C, III |
|
March 24, 2006 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF TITLE Comment: CERTIFICATE OF TITLE RECORDED: OR15010PG2692-001; VER: R; K Vol./Book 15010, Page 2692, 001 pages
Judge: DOWNEY, BRANDT C, III |
|
March 13, 2006 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT Comment: AFFIDAVIT OF POST JUDGMENT INTEREST/ADVANCES; VER: F; P
Judge: DOWNEY, BRANDT C, III |
|
March 13, 2006 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF SALE Comment: CERTIFICATE OF SALE WELLS FARGO BANK NA; VER: F; K
Judge: DOWNEY, BRANDT C, III |
|
March 13, 2006 | Docket Event |
Certificate Of Sale - Fee Paid $70.00 Comment: CERTIFICATE OF SALE - FEE PAID $60.00; VER: N; P
Judge: DOWNEY, BRANDT C, III |
|
February 24, 2006 | Docket Event |
PUBLISHER'S AFFIDAVIT NOTICE OF SALE Comment: PUBLISHERS AFFIDAVIT NOTICE OF SALE; VER: F; P
Judge: DOWNEY, BRANDT C, III |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.