Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Citibank South Dakota N A, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Richard W Battaglino, against Mcleod, George C, represented by Christie D Arkovich, Esq, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with CASE, JAMES R presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCASE, JAMES R Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 09, 2005 |
CategoryContracts And Indebtedness - Circuit |
Last RefreshedSeptember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
REQUESTED COPY SENT VIA Doc # 3 US MAIL
Judge: CASE, JAMES R |
|
November 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR COPIES Doc # 2
Judge: CASE, JAMES R |
|
January 10, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE Doc # 1 AND NOTICE OF CONFIRMATION OF NEW LEAD ATTORNEY Party: CITIBANK SOUTH DAKOTA N A
Judge: CASE, JAMES R |
|
April 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
CC JUDGMENT MADE-HANDED RECORDING
Judge: CASE, JAMES R |
|
March 21, 2007 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES Comment: NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES; VER: F; D
Judge: CASE, JAMES R |
|
February 20, 2007 | Docket Event |
INTERROGATORIES Comment: INTERROGATORIES IN AID OF EXECUTION; VER: F; P
Judge: CASE, JAMES R |
|
June 14, 2006 | Docket Event |
Recording Of Judgment Lien - Fee Paid $ Comment: RECORDING OF JDMT LIEN - FEE PAID $10.00; VER: N; P
Judge: CASE, JAMES R |
|
June 13, 2006 | Docket Event |
CC JUDGMENT MADE-HANDED RECORDING Comment: C/C JUDGEMENT MADE/HANDED RECORDING OR15185PG2224-001; VER: N; K Vol./Book 15185, Page 2224, 001 pages
Judge: CASE, JAMES R |
|
June 13, 2006 | Docket Event |
PRAECIPE FOR RECORDATION OF JDMT AS LIEN Comment: PRAECIPE FOR RECORDATION OF JDMT AS LIEN; VER: F; P
Judge: CASE, JAMES R |
|
May 03, 2006 | Docket Event |
FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT Comment: FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR15099PG0080-001; VER: F; P Vol./Book 15099, Page 0080, 001 pages
Judge: CASE, JAMES R |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.