Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Nichols, Warren Scott, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Paul Puzzanghera, Esq, against Holmes, Chandra V, represented by Raymond A Haas, Esq, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with BOYER, BRUCE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBOYER, BRUCE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 09, 2005 |
CategoryAuto Negligence - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 08, 2010 | Docket Event |
TEXT Comment: NOTICE FINAL DISPOSITION OF REFERRAL SETTLED; VER: F; P
Judge: BOYER, BRUCE |
|
February 08, 2010 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING Comment: NOTICE OF HEARING 040510 9:00 (ARBITRATION); VER: F; P
Judge: BOYER, BRUCE |
|
November 06, 2009 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF REFERRAL Comment: ORDER OF REFERRAL TO NONBINDING ARBITRATION; VER: F; P
Judge: BOYER, BRUCE |
|
November 06, 2009 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CANCELLATION Comment: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION HEARING 110509; VER: F; D
Judge: BOYER, BRUCE |
|
October 22, 2009 | Docket Event |
AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING Comment: SECOND AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING 110509 1:30; VER: F; D
Judge: BOYER, BRUCE |
|
July 21, 2009 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING Comment: NOTICE OF HEARING 100509 1:30; VER: F; D
Judge: BOYER, BRUCE |
|
July 08, 2009 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING Comment: NOTICE OF HEARING 071009 2:00; VER: F; D
Judge: BOYER, BRUCE |
|
July 01, 2009 | Docket Event |
OBJECTION Comment: OBJECTION TO NOTICE OF HEARING; VER: F; D
Judge: BOYER, BRUCE |
|
June 11, 2009 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING Comment: NOTICE OF HEARING 090809 AT 10:00; VER: F; P
Judge: BOYER, BRUCE |
|
January 09, 2009 | Docket Event |
ORDER Comment: ORDER RE: AWARD OF ATTORNEY FEES; VER: F; P
Judge: BOYER, BRUCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.