Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Bank Of America N A Usa, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Jason D Barlow, Esq, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with JIROTKA, GEORGE M presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJIROTKA, GEORGE M Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 31, 2005 |
CategoryContracts And Indebtedness - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 17, 2009 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF DISMISSAL Comment: ORDER OF DISMISSAL OR16559PG0260-001; VER: F; P Vol./Book 16559, Page 0260, 001 pages
Judge: JIROTKA, GEORGE M |
|
April 17, 2009 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) Comment: CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING; VER: F; P
Judge: JIROTKA, GEORGE M |
|
April 17, 2009 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Comment: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM; VER: F; P
Judge: JIROTKA, GEORGE M |
|
March 19, 2009 | Docket Event |
ORDER Comment: ORDER TO APPEAR FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 041709 10:30; VER: F; P
Judge: JIROTKA, GEORGE M |
|
July 11, 2006 | Docket Event |
SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY AS TO Comment: SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY AS TO: JOHN S MCDANIEL; VER: F; D
Judge: JIROTKA, GEORGE M |
|
February 01, 2006 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT ENTERED Comment: DEFAULT ENTERED; VER: N; K
Judge: JIROTKA, GEORGE M |
|
January 31, 2006 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE Comment: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE; VER: F; P
Judge: JIROTKA, GEORGE M |
|
January 31, 2006 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Comment: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM; VER: F; P
Judge: JIROTKA, GEORGE M |
|
January 31, 2006 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT Comment: AFFIDAVIT AS TO CALCULATION OF INTEREST; VER: F; P
Judge: JIROTKA, GEORGE M |
|
January 31, 2006 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT Comment: AFFIDAVIT OF ACCOUNT; VER: F; P
Judge: JIROTKA, GEORGE M |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.