Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
True Logic Financial, Huntington National Bank, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Jason D Barlow, Esq, against Saia, Karen R, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with DOWNEY, BRANDT C, III presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDOWNEY, BRANDT C, III Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 31, 2005 |
CategoryContracts And Indebtedness - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 31, 2006 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES Comment: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES IN AID OF EXECUTION; VER: F; P
Judge: DOWNEY, BRANDT C, III |
|
May 31, 2006 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION Comment: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; VER: F; P
Judge: DOWNEY, BRANDT C, III |
|
April 10, 2006 | Docket Event |
Recording Of Judgment Lien - Fee Paid $ Comment: RECORDING OF JDMT LIEN - FEE PAID $10.00; VER: N; P
Judge: DOWNEY, BRANDT C, III |
|
April 07, 2006 | Docket Event |
CC JUDGMENT MADE-HANDED RECORDING Comment: C/C JUDGEMENT MADE/HANDED RECORDING; VER: R; K
Judge: DOWNEY, BRANDT C, III |
|
April 07, 2006 | Docket Event |
PRAECIPE FOR RECORDATION OF JDMT AS LIEN Comment: PRAECIPE FOR RECORDATION OF JDMT AS LIEN; VER: F; P
Judge: DOWNEY, BRANDT C, III |
|
March 21, 2006 | Docket Event |
ORDER GRANTING Comment: ORDER GRANTING MOTION SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR15043PG2223-001; VER: F; P Vol./Book 15043, Page 2223, 001 pages
Judge: DOWNEY, BRANDT C, III |
|
March 21, 2006 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Comment: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM; VER: F; P
Judge: DOWNEY, BRANDT C, III |
|
March 21, 2006 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT (SRS) Comment: JUDGMENT; VER: N; P
Judge: DOWNEY, BRANDT C, III |
|
March 21, 2006 | Docket Event |
SUMMARY JUDGMENT Comment: SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR15005PG0590-001; VER: F; P Vol./Book 15005, Page 0590, 001 pages
Judge: DOWNEY, BRANDT C, III |
|
March 15, 2006 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT Comment: AFFIDAVIT IN PROOF OF COSTS; VER: F; P
Judge: DOWNEY, BRANDT C, III |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.