Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Israel, Netsah, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Michael J Babboni, Esq, against Vickers, Stuart F, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with WILLIAMS, AMY M presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWILLIAMS, AMY M Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 31, 2005 |
CategoryAuto Negligence - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 30, 2007 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) Comment: CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING; VER: N; P
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
|
November 30, 2007 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Comment: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM; VER: F; P
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
|
November 30, 2007 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF DISMISSAL Comment: ORDER OF DISMISSAL W/PREJUDICE OR16072PG1896-001; VER: F; P Vol./Book 16072, Page 1896, 001 pages
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
|
November 30, 2007 | Docket Event |
JOINT STIPULATION Comment: JOINT STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL; VER: F; P
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
|
November 30, 2007 | Docket Event |
ATTORNEY COVER LETTER Comment: ATTORNEY COVER LETTER RECEIVED BY COURT 112807; VER: F; D
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
|
August 02, 2007 | Docket Event |
DEF-RESP'S MOTION TO COMPEL Comment: MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY; VER: F; D
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
|
July 20, 2007 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES Comment: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF SECOND INTERROGATORIES; VER: F; D
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
|
December 01, 2006 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE SUPP INTERROGATORIES Comment: NOTICE OF SERVICE SUPP INTERROGATORIES; VER: F; D
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
|
November 27, 2006 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF NON-ATTENDANCE OF Comment: CERTIFICATE OF NON-ATTENDANCE OF: NETSAH ISRAEL 102506; VER: F; D
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
|
November 27, 2006 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING Comment: NOTICE OF FILING; VER: F; D
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.