Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
John Boyle And Company Inc, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by J Carlton Mitchell, against Polcyn, Roger F, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with RONDOLINO, ANTHONY presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRONDOLINO, ANTHONY Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 31, 2005 |
CategoryContracts And Indebtedness - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 08, 2009 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Comment: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/OUT PREJUDICE; VER: F; P
Judge: RONDOLINO, ANTHONY |
|
January 08, 2009 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) Comment: CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING; VER: N; P
Judge: RONDOLINO, ANTHONY |
|
December 22, 2008 | Docket Event |
NOTICE-LACK OF PROS-DISM 000000-MLD AS TO Comment: POLCYN ROGER F; VER: N; K
Judge: RONDOLINO, ANTHONY |
|
December 22, 2008 | Docket Event |
NOTICE-LACK OF PROS-DISM 000000-MLD AS TO Comment: NOTICE OF LACK OF PROSECUTION MAILED AS TO:; VER: N; K
Judge: RONDOLINO, ANTHONY |
|
January 28, 2008 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF GOOD CAUSE Comment: NOTICE OF GOOD CAUSE; VER: F; P
Judge: RONDOLINO, ANTHONY |
|
January 22, 2008 | Docket Event |
NOTICE-LACK OF PROS-DISM 000000-MLD AS TO Comment: NOTICE OF LACK OF PROSECUTION MAILED AS TO:; VER: N; K
Judge: RONDOLINO, ANTHONY |
|
January 22, 2008 | Docket Event |
NOTICE-LACK OF PROS-DISM 000000-MLD AS TO Comment: POLCYN ROGER F; VER: N; K
Judge: RONDOLINO, ANTHONY |
|
February 23, 2007 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF GOOD CAUSE Comment: NOTICE OF GOOD CAUSE; VER: F; P
Judge: RONDOLINO, ANTHONY |
|
December 26, 2006 | Docket Event |
NOTICE-LACK OF PROS-DISM 000000-MLD AS TO Comment: NOTICE OF LACK OF PROSECUTION MAILED AS TO:; VER: N; K
Judge: RONDOLINO, ANTHONY |
|
December 26, 2006 | Docket Event |
NOTICE-LACK OF PROS-DISM 000000-MLD AS TO Comment: ARTBILT AWNINGS INC - ARTBILT SENT IN ERROR; VER: N; K
Judge: RONDOLINO, ANTHONY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.