Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, Sheps Marketing Inc, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Rebecca S Sinclair, against Custer, Virginia Gay, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with DOWNEY, BRANDT C, III presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDOWNEY, BRANDT C, III Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 28, 2005 |
CategoryAuto Negligence - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 12, 2006 | Docket Event |
CC JUDGMENT MADE-HANDED RECORDING Comment: C/C JUDGEMENT MADE/HANDED RECORDING OR15053PG1499-002; VER: R; K Vol./Book 15053, Page 1499, 002 pages
Judge: DOWNEY, BRANDT C, III |
|
April 12, 2006 | Docket Event |
Recording Of Judgment Lien - Fee Paid $ Comment: RECORDING OF JDMT LIEN - FEE PAID $10.00; VER: N; P
Judge: DOWNEY, BRANDT C, III |
|
April 11, 2006 | Docket Event |
PRAECIPE FOR RECORDATION OF JDMT AS LIEN Comment: PRAECIPE FOR RECORDATION OF JDMT AS LIEN; VER: F; P
Judge: DOWNEY, BRANDT C, III |
|
March 09, 2006 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Comment: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM; VER: F; P
Judge: DOWNEY, BRANDT C, III |
|
March 09, 2006 | Docket Event |
ATTORNEY COVER LETTER Comment: ATTORNEY COVER LETTER; VER: F; P
Judge: DOWNEY, BRANDT C, III |
|
March 09, 2006 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT Comment: FINAL JUDGMENT OR14982PG2582-002; VER: F; P Vol./Book 14982, Page 2582, 002 pages
Judge: DOWNEY, BRANDT C, III |
|
March 09, 2006 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT JUDGMENT (SRS DISPO) Comment: DEFAULT JUDGMENT; VER: N; P
Judge: DOWNEY, BRANDT C, III |
|
March 06, 2006 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING Comment: NOTICE OF FILING ATTACHEDNON-MALITARY AFFIDAVIT; VER: F; P
Judge: DOWNEY, BRANDT C, III |
|
March 06, 2006 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS Comment: AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS AND INTERE; VER: F; P
Judge: DOWNEY, BRANDT C, III |
|
December 29, 2005 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT ENTERED Comment: DEFAULT ENTERED; VER: F; K
Judge: DOWNEY, BRANDT C, III |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.