Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Adams, Doug, filed a(n) Other Civil - Circuit case represented by David J Sockol, Esq, against Merrick, Patricia, represented by Karen E Maller, Esq, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with QUESADA, FRANK presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeQUESADA, FRANK Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 28, 2005 |
CategoryOther Civil - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
GARNISHMENT ACCOUNTING SHEET CITY OF ST PETERSBURG FLORIDA
Judge: QUESADA, FRANK |
|
February 28, 2006 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Comment: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/PREJUDICE; VER: F; P
Judge: QUESADA, FRANK |
|
February 28, 2006 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - BEFORE HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) Comment: CASE DISMISSED - BEFORE HEARING; VER: N; P
Judge: QUESADA, FRANK |
|
December 01, 2005 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE Comment: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS COUNSEL; VER: F; D
Judge: QUESADA, FRANK |
|
November 28, 2005 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION TO STRIKE Comment: MOTION STRIKE AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; VER: F; P
Judge: QUESADA, FRANK |
|
November 28, 2005 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION TO DISMISS Comment: MTN DISM FAIL STATE CAUSE OF ACTION COUNTERCLAIM; VER: F; P
Judge: QUESADA, FRANK |
|
November 18, 2005 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES Comment: AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND; VER: N; D
Judge: QUESADA, FRANK |
|
November 18, 2005 | Docket Event |
ANSWER OF Comment: ANSWER OF: PATRICIA MERRICK; VER: N; D
Judge: QUESADA, FRANK |
|
November 18, 2005 | Docket Event |
COUNTER CLAIM Comment: COUNTER CLAIM; VER: F; D
Judge: QUESADA, FRANK |
|
November 08, 2005 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS - SERVED Comment: SUMMONS RETD SERVED PATRICIA MERRICK 110105; VER: F; P
Judge: QUESADA, FRANK |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.