Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Williams, Chernique, Florida State Ofdepartment Of Revenue, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case against Myrick, Montrese, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with REQUIRED, NO JUDGE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeREQUIRED, NO JUDGE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 27, 2005 |
CategoryIv-D Interstate Uifsa |
Last RefreshedOctober 13, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 25, 2020 | Docket Event |
ARREARS CALCULATION SHEET Doc # 2
Judge: REQUIRED, NO JUDGE |
|
February 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
MEMORANDUM TO CLERK Doc # 1 FROM DOR TO CLOSE CASE
Judge: REQUIRED, NO JUDGE |
|
November 03, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF PLAINTIFF
Judge: REQUIRED, NO JUDGE |
|
September 25, 2015 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE FROM CLERK RE ARREARS DUE
Judge: REQUIRED, NO JUDGE |
|
September 25, 2015 | Docket Event |
ARREARS CALCULATION SHEET
Judge: REQUIRED, NO JUDGE |
|
August 25, 2010 | Docket Event |
ARREARS CALCULATION SHEET Comment: ARREARS CALCULATION SCREEN; VER: F; K
Judge: REQUIRED, NO JUDGE |
|
August 23, 2010 | Docket Event |
ARREARS CALCULATION SHEET Comment: ARREARS CALCULATION SHEET FROM VA; VER: F; P
Judge: REQUIRED, NO JUDGE |
|
August 23, 2010 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE TO CLERK RE Comment: CORRESPONDENCE TO CLERK RE: SUPPORT W/ATTACHED COPY; VER: F; P
Judge: REQUIRED, NO JUDGE |
|
February 07, 2006 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE TO CLERK RE Comment: CORRESPONDENCE TO CLERK RE: INCOME W/HOLDING ORDER; VER: F; P
Judge: REQUIRED, NO JUDGE |
|
November 28, 2005 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE TO CLERK RE Comment: CORRESPONDENCE TO CLERK RE: ACKNOWLEDGMENT; VER: F; P
Judge: REQUIRED, NO JUDGE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.