Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Jwanouskos, Linda, Florida State Ofdepartment Of Revenue, filed a(n) Judgment Enforcement - Creditor case against Jwanouskos, Anthony, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with TODD, KIMBERLY presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTODD, KIMBERLY Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 27, 2005 |
CategoryEnforce Foreign Judgment - Other - Non Ivd |
Last RefreshedDecember 30, 2020 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeJudgment Enforcement |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE REDIRECT SUPPORT FROM DOR Doc # 3
Judge: TODD, KIMBERLY |
|
May 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
ARREARS CALCULATION SHEET Doc # 1
Judge: TODD, KIMBERLY |
|
May 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
COPY CORRESPONDENCE FROM CLERK RE Doc # 2 TO BOTH PARTIES - CASE CLOSED
Judge: TODD, KIMBERLY |
|
May 10, 2016 | Docket Event |
ARREARS CALCULATION SHEET
Judge: TODD, KIMBERLY |
|
May 06, 2016 | Docket Event |
FINDINGS-ORDER OF COURT RE DENYING MOTN TO ABATE ARREARS
Judge: TODD, KIMBERLY |
|
May 06, 2016 | Docket Event |
ARREARAGE AFFIDAVIT (EXHIBIT 1)
Judge: TODD, KIMBERLY |
|
May 06, 2016 | Docket Event |
RESPONDENT'S QUESTIONNAIRE ENTERED AS EXHIBIT
Judge: TODD, KIMBERLY |
|
March 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF MAILING Party: FLORIDA STATE OFDEPARTMENT OF REVENUE Party: MCCARTHY, AMANDA GAEL
Judge: TODD, KIMBERLY |
|
March 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
PETITION FOR MODIFICATION PRO SE
Judge: TODD, KIMBERLY |
|
December 31, 2013 | Docket Event |
REOPEN - CLOSED
Judge: TODD, KIMBERLY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.