Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Kings Lynn Lake Apartments Llc, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by John E Mcmillan, against Hall, Brian C, Hall, Alessandra, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with McNARY, MYRA presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMcNARY, MYRA Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 27, 2005 |
CategoryDelinquent Tenant - County |
Last RefreshedDecember 30, 2020 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 16, 2006 | Docket Event |
Recording Of Satisfaction - Fee Paid $ Comment: RECORDING OF SATISFACTION - FEE PAID $10.00; VER: N; P
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
November 15, 2006 | Docket Event |
SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT Comment: SATISFACTION OF JUDGEMENT AS TO ALESSANDRAOR15482PG1998-001; VER: R; K Vol./Book 15482, Page 1998, 001 pages
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
March 20, 2006 | Docket Event |
CC JUDGMENT MADE-HANDED RECORDING Comment: C/C JUDGEMENT MADE/HANDED RECORDING; VER: R; K
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
March 20, 2006 | Docket Event |
Recording Of Judgment Lien - Fee Paid $ Comment: RECORDING OF JDMT LIEN - FEE PAID $10.00; VER: N; P
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
March 16, 2006 | Docket Event |
PRAECIPE FOR RECORDATION OF JDMT AS LIEN Comment: PRAECIPE FOR RECORDATION OF JDMT AS LIEN; VER: R; P
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
November 10, 2005 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT Comment: FINAL JUDGMENT COUNT II OR14739PG0354-001; VER: F; P Vol./Book 14739, Page 0354, 001 pages
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
November 10, 2005 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Comment: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM; VER: F; P
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
November 08, 2005 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT ENTERED Comment: DEFAULT ENTERED COUNT II BOTH DEFENDANTS; VER: F; K
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
November 07, 2005 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT Comment: MOTION FOR DEFAULT COUNT II AND; VER: N; P
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
November 07, 2005 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT Comment: MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT COUNT II; VER: F; P
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.