Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Spychalski, Connie, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by W Thomas Frost, against Wheelock, Michael V, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with VACCARO, DOROTHY presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeVACCARO, DOROTHY Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 24, 2005 |
CategorySmall Claims |
Last RefreshedOctober 13, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 20, 2009 | Docket Event |
Recording Of Satisfaction - Fee Paid $ Comment: RECORDING OF SATISFACTION - FEE PAID $18.50; VER: N; P
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
February 19, 2009 | Docket Event |
SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT Comment: SATISFACTION OF JUDGEMENT OR16505PG0067-002; VER: R; P Vol./Book 16505, Page 0067, 002 pages
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
February 13, 2009 | Docket Event |
SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT Comment: SATISFACTION OF JUDGEMENT; VER: F; P
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
March 09, 2006 | Docket Event |
Recording Of Judgment Lien - Fee Paid $ Comment: RECORDING OF JDMT LIEN - FEE PAID $18.50; VER: N; P
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
March 09, 2006 | Docket Event |
CC JUDGMENT MADE-HANDED RECORDING Comment: C/C JUDGEMENT MADE/HANDED RECORDING; VER: R; K
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
March 08, 2006 | Docket Event |
PRAECIPE FOR RECORDATION OF JDMT AS LIEN Comment: PRAECIPE FOR RECORDATION OF JDMT AS LIEN; VER: F; P
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
January 04, 2006 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT JUDGMENT (SRS DISPO) Comment: DEFAULT JUDGMENT; VER: N; P
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
January 04, 2006 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT JUDGMENT Comment: DEFAULT JUDGMENT $3936.04 PRIN $701.93 INT $288.75 COST; VER: F; P
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
January 04, 2006 | Docket Event |
RECORDED AT Comment: RECORDED AT: OR14858PG0630-002; VER: N; P Vol./Book 14858, Page 0630, 002 pages
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
December 29, 2005 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS Comment: AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS AND INTEREST; VER: F; P
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.