Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Bovano Usa Co, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Gilbert M Singer, Esq, against Selenas And Associates Inc, represented by Steve Bartlett, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with QUESADA, FRANK presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeQUESADA, FRANK Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 31, 2005 |
CategoryContracts And Indebtedness - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 11, 2006 | Docket Event |
SUBPOENA FOR DEPO Comment: SUBPOENA FOR DEPO SERVED; VER: F; P
Judge: QUESADA, FRANK |
|
September 15, 2006 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION Comment: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; VER: F; P
Judge: QUESADA, FRANK |
|
May 11, 2006 | Docket Event |
SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM FOR DEPOSITION Comment: SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM FOR DEPO NON SERVED; VER: F; P
Judge: QUESADA, FRANK |
|
March 29, 2006 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION Comment: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; VER: F; P
Judge: QUESADA, FRANK |
|
March 22, 2006 | Docket Event |
CC JUDGMENT MADE-HANDED RECORDING Comment: C/C JUDGEMENT MADE/HANDED RECORDING OR15005PG0497-001; VER: R; K Vol./Book 15005, Page 0497, 001 pages
Judge: QUESADA, FRANK |
|
March 22, 2006 | Docket Event |
PRAECIPE FOR RECORDATION OF JDMT AS LIEN Comment: PRAECIPE FOR RECORDATION OF JDMT AS LIEN; VER: F; P
Judge: QUESADA, FRANK |
|
March 22, 2006 | Docket Event |
Recording Of Judgment Lien - Fee Paid $ Comment: RECORDING OF JDMT LIEN - FEE PAID $10.00; VER: N; P
Judge: QUESADA, FRANK |
|
February 23, 2006 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT (SRS) Comment: JUDGMENT; VER: N; P
Judge: QUESADA, FRANK |
|
February 23, 2006 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT Comment: FINAL JUDGMENT OR14954PG0411-001; VER: F; P Vol./Book 14954, Page 0411, 001 pages
Judge: QUESADA, FRANK |
|
February 23, 2006 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Comment: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM; VER: F; P
Judge: QUESADA, FRANK |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.