Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Ramsey, Nathaniel, Ramsey, Joyce, filed a(n) General Negligence - Torts case represented by Daniel J Leeper, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with WILLIAMS, AMY M presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWILLIAMS, AMY M Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 31, 2005 |
CategoryNegligence - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Negligence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 26, 2006 | Docket Event |
ATTORNEY COVER LETTER Comment: ATTORNEY COVER LETTER; VER: F; D
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
|
December 26, 2006 | Docket Event |
ORDER Comment: ORDER OF DISMISSAL W/PREJUDICE OR15554PG1453-001; VER: F; D Vol./Book 15554, Page 1453, 001 pages
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
|
December 26, 2006 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Comment: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM; VER: F; D
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
|
December 22, 2006 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - BEFORE HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) Comment: CASE DISMISSED - BEFORE HEARING; VER: N; P
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
|
December 22, 2006 | Docket Event |
JOINT STIPULATION Comment: JOINT STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL; VER: N; P
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
|
December 22, 2006 | Docket Event |
WITHOUT PREJUDICE Comment: WITHOUT PREJUDICE; VER: F; P
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
|
November 21, 2006 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION Comment: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO ALBERTSONS; VER: F; D
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
|
November 13, 2006 | Docket Event |
NOT. OF SERV. OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT Comment: NOT. OF SERV. OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT; VER: F; P
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
|
November 13, 2006 | Docket Event |
PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT Comment: PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT; VER: F; P
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
|
November 01, 2006 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION Comment: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; VER: F; D
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.