Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Premium Asset Recovery Corp, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by Rodolfo J Miro, against Steward, Jo A, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with VACCARO, DOROTHY presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeVACCARO, DOROTHY Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 27, 2005 |
CategorySmall Claims |
Last RefreshedOctober 12, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
April 14, 2008 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Comment: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM; VER: F; P
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
April 14, 2008 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT JUDGMENT (SRS DISPO) Comment: DEFAULT JUDGMENT; VER: F; P
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
April 14, 2008 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT JUDGMENT Comment: DEFAULT JUDGMENT $4327.93 PRIN $280. COSTSOR16218PG2483-001; VER: F; P Vol./Book 16218, Page 2483, 001 pages
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
April 08, 2008 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS Comment: AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS; VER: F; P
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
April 08, 2008 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT Comment: AFFIDAVIT PROOF CLAIM/NON-MILITARY SERVICE; VER: F; P
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
December 06, 2006 | Docket Event |
ORDER Comment: ORDER SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEYS; VER: F; P
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
December 04, 2006 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION Comment: JOINT MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEYS; VER: F; P
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
July 08, 2005 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION-ORDER APPROVING PAYMENT Comment: STIPULATION/ORDER APPROVING PAYMENT; VER: F; P
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
July 08, 2005 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION-ORDER APPROVING PAYMENT (SRS DISPO) Comment: STIPULATION/ORDER APPROVING PAYMENT; VER: F; P
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.