Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Amsouth Bank, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by J Andrew Baldwin, Esq, against Spieldenner, Roseann, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with LENDERMAN, JOHN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLENDERMAN, JOHN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 29, 2005 |
CategoryMortgage Foreclosure - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 09, 2005 | Docket Event |
Recording Of Satisfaction - Fee Paid $ Comment: RECORDING OF SATISFACTION - FEE PAID $10.00; VER: N; P
Judge: LENDERMAN, JOHN C |
|
November 08, 2005 | Docket Event |
SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT Comment: SATISFACTION OF JUDGEMENT OR14735PG0599-001; VER: R; P Vol./Book 14735, Page 0599, 001 pages
Judge: LENDERMAN, JOHN C |
|
October 27, 2005 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE FROM CLERK RE Comment: CORRESPONDENCE FROM CLERK RE: RTN SAT W/CHECK INCORRECT FEE; VER: F; K
Judge: LENDERMAN, JOHN C |
|
October 18, 2005 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE FROM CLERK RE Comment: CORRESPONDENCE FROM CLERK RE: NEED FEES TO RECORD SATJ; VER: F; K
Judge: LENDERMAN, JOHN C |
|
October 07, 2005 | Docket Event |
FORECLOSURE SALE CANCELLED BANKRUPTCY Comment: FORECLOSURE SALE CANCELLED: PER JUDGE LENDERMAN AGREEMENT(KMB); VER: N; K
Judge: LENDERMAN, JOHN C |
|
September 28, 2005 | Docket Event |
SUPPLEMENTAL Comment: SUPPLEMENTAL AFFIDAVIT OF COUSTS; VER: F; P
Judge: LENDERMAN, JOHN C |
|
September 27, 2005 | Docket Event |
PUBLISHER'S AFFIDAVIT NOTICE OF SALE Comment: PUBLISHERS AFFIDAVIT NOTICE OF SALE; VER: F; P
Judge: LENDERMAN, JOHN C |
|
September 08, 2005 | Docket Event |
Notice Of Sale/Copy To Gulf Coast Bus Rev Comment: NOTICE OF SALE/COPY TO GULF COAST BUS REV; VER: F; K
Judge: LENDERMAN, JOHN C |
|
September 07, 2005 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE Comment: FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE/JDMT AMOUNT $ 39208.26; VER: N; P
Judge: LENDERMAN, JOHN C |
|
September 07, 2005 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING Comment: NOTICE OF FILING MORTGAGE; VER: F; P
Judge: LENDERMAN, JOHN C |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.