Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Yagmin Ceiling And Drywall Company Inc, filed a(n) Liens - Creditor case represented by R Michael Deloach, against Werly, Albert C, Walker, Victoria, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with RONDOLINO, ANTHONY presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRONDOLINO, ANTHONY Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 29, 2005 |
CategoryLien Foreclosure - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeLiens |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 14, 2005 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) Comment: CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING; VER: N; P
Judge: RONDOLINO, ANTHONY |
|
October 14, 2005 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Comment: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM; VER: F; P
Judge: RONDOLINO, ANTHONY |
|
October 14, 2005 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Comment: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/PREJUDICE; VER: F; P
Judge: RONDOLINO, ANTHONY |
|
September 29, 2005 | Docket Event |
TEXT Comment: NOTICE FINAL DISPOSITION OF REFERRAL -SETTLED; VER: F; P
Judge: RONDOLINO, ANTHONY |
|
September 20, 2005 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MEDIATION Comment: ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MEDIATION; VER: F; P
Judge: RONDOLINO, ANTHONY |
|
September 20, 2005 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE Comment: NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE 092605 1:00; VER: F; P
Judge: RONDOLINO, ANTHONY |
|
September 15, 2005 | Docket Event |
ORDER Comment: ORDER FOR MEDIATION 092605 @ 1:00; VER: F; P
Judge: RONDOLINO, ANTHONY |
|
September 15, 2005 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION Comment: STIPULATION /; VER: N; P
Judge: RONDOLINO, ANTHONY |
|
September 15, 2005 | Docket Event |
ATTORNEY COVER LETTER Comment: ATTORNEY COVER LETTER RECEIVED BY COURT; VER: F; P
Judge: RONDOLINO, ANTHONY |
|
September 12, 2005 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE Comment: NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE 092605 1:00; VER: F; P
Judge: RONDOLINO, ANTHONY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.