Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Karbe, Jeremy R, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Paul E Berg, against Largo City Of, represented by T R Unice Jr, Esq, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with KHOUZAM, NELLY N presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKHOUZAM, NELLY N Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 28, 2005 |
CategoryAuto Negligence - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 23, 2006 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF DISMISSAL Comment: ORDER OF DISMISSAL W/PREJUDICE OR15141PG2630-001; VER: F; P Vol./Book 15141, Page 2630, 001 pages
Judge: KHOUZAM, NELLY N |
|
May 23, 2006 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) Comment: CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING; VER: N; P
Judge: KHOUZAM, NELLY N |
|
May 23, 2006 | Docket Event |
JOINT STIPULATION Comment: JOINT STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL W/PREJUDICE; VER: F; P
Judge: KHOUZAM, NELLY N |
|
May 15, 2006 | Docket Event |
SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM WITHOUT DEPO Comment: SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM W/O DEPO NO SERVICE ATTACHED (5); VER: F; D
Judge: KHOUZAM, NELLY N |
|
April 06, 2006 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY Comment: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION OF NON-PARTY 040506; VER: F; D
Judge: KHOUZAM, NELLY N |
|
March 20, 2006 | Docket Event |
NOTICE TRIAL-ORDER PRETRIAL CONFERENCE Comment: NOTICE TRIAL/ORDER PRETRIAL CONFERENCE 082806 10:00; VER: F; P
Judge: KHOUZAM, NELLY N |
|
March 20, 2006 | Docket Event |
TRIAL WEEK OF Comment: TRIAL WEEK OF: 091106; VER: F; P
Judge: KHOUZAM, NELLY N |
|
March 15, 2006 | Docket Event |
NOT. OF SERV. OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT Comment: NOT. OF SERV. OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT; VER: F; P
Judge: KHOUZAM, NELLY N |
|
March 15, 2006 | Docket Event |
DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL Comment: DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; VER: N; P
Judge: KHOUZAM, NELLY N |
|
March 15, 2006 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION TO SET TRIAL Comment: MOTION SET TRIAL; VER: F; P
Judge: KHOUZAM, NELLY N |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.