Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Amsouth Bank, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Ronald B Cohn, against Neumann, Carolyn, Neumann, Robert T, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with QUESADA, FRANK presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeQUESADA, FRANK Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 28, 2005 |
CategoryMortgage Foreclosure - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 13, 2005 | Docket Event |
Lis Pendens Recording - Fee Paid $ Comment: LIS PENDENS RECORDING FEE PAID - $5.00; VER: N; P
Judge: QUESADA, FRANK |
|
July 12, 2005 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Comment: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL /; VER: N; P
Judge: QUESADA, FRANK |
|
July 12, 2005 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - BEFORE HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) Comment: CASE DISMISSED - BEFORE HEARING; VER: N; P
Judge: QUESADA, FRANK |
|
July 12, 2005 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Comment: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM; VER: F; P
Judge: QUESADA, FRANK |
|
July 12, 2005 | Docket Event |
RELEASE-DISCHARGE OF LIS PENDENS Comment: RELEASE OF LIS PENDENS OR14454PG0872-001; VER: F; P Vol./Book 14454, Page 0872, 001 pages
Judge: QUESADA, FRANK |
|
June 17, 2005 | Docket Event |
ANSWER OF Comment: ANSWER OF: CAROLYN NEUMANN 052105; VER: F; K
Judge: QUESADA, FRANK |
|
June 17, 2005 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS - SERVED Comment: SUMMONS RETD SERVED ROBERT T NEUMANN 052105; VER: F; K
Judge: QUESADA, FRANK |
|
June 17, 2005 | Docket Event | SUMMONS - RETURNED SERVED Comment: SUMMONS RETD SERVED ROBERT T NEUMANN 052105; VER: F; K | |
June 16, 2005 | Docket Event |
LETTER FROM CLERK RE NO DEFAULT ENTERED Comment: LETTER FROM CLERK RE: NO DEFAULT ENTERED; VER: F; K
Judge: QUESADA, FRANK |
|
June 15, 2005 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT Comment: MOTION FOR DEFAULT (2) - NO AFFDS OF SERVICE/NO NONMILITARY; VER: F; P
Judge: QUESADA, FRANK |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.