Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Davis, Amy, filed a(n) Other Civil - Circuit case represented by Karen E Maller, Esq, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with RONDOLINO, ANTHONY presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRONDOLINO, ANTHONY Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 28, 2005 |
CategoryOther Civil - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 23, 2005 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Comment: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM; VER: F; P
Judge: RONDOLINO, ANTHONY |
|
December 23, 2005 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) Comment: CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING; VER: N; P
Judge: RONDOLINO, ANTHONY |
|
December 23, 2005 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Comment: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/PREJUDICE; VER: F; P
Judge: RONDOLINO, ANTHONY |
|
August 31, 2005 | Docket Event |
TEXT Comment: NOTICE FINAL DISPOSITION OF REFERRAL - SETTLED; VER: F; P
Judge: RONDOLINO, ANTHONY |
|
August 04, 2005 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE Comment: NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE 082905 9:00; VER: F; P
Judge: RONDOLINO, ANTHONY |
|
July 25, 2005 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MEDIATION Comment: ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MEDIATION; VER: F; P
Judge: RONDOLINO, ANTHONY |
|
June 28, 2005 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION Comment: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; VER: F; D
Judge: RONDOLINO, ANTHONY |
|
June 10, 2005 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE Comment: RESPONSE /OBJECTIONS TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; VER: F; P
Judge: RONDOLINO, ANTHONY |
|
May 26, 2005 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION Comment: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; VER: F; P
Judge: RONDOLINO, ANTHONY |
|
May 24, 2005 | Docket Event |
NOTICE Comment: NOTICE FOR TRIAL; VER: F; P
Judge: RONDOLINO, ANTHONY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.