Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Ridgemoor Master Association Inc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Joseph R Cianfrone, against Stephenson, Joseph L, Stephenson, Darlene, Any Unknown Occupants In Possession, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with BOYER, BRUCE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBOYER, BRUCE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 28, 2005 |
CategoryMortgage Foreclosure - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 15, 2010 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE Comment: CORRESPONDENCE RE: ENDED EMPLOYMENT; VER: F; P
Judge: BOYER, BRUCE |
|
May 18, 2005 | Docket Event |
CERTIFIED COPY Comment: CERTIFIED COPY RELEASE OF LIEN/CANCELLATION LIS PENDENS; VER: F; K
Judge: BOYER, BRUCE |
|
May 10, 2005 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Comment: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL AND; VER: N; P
Judge: BOYER, BRUCE |
|
May 10, 2005 | Docket Event |
RELEASE-DISCHARGE OF LIS PENDENS Comment: RELEASE OF LIEN/CANCELLATION LIS PENDENS OR14313PG2207-001; VER: R; K Vol./Book 14313, Page 2207, 001 pages
Judge: BOYER, BRUCE |
|
May 10, 2005 | Docket Event |
Lis Pendens Recording - Fee Paid $ Comment: LIS PENDENS RECORDING FEE PAID - $5.00; VER: N; P
Judge: BOYER, BRUCE |
|
May 10, 2005 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - BEFORE HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) Comment: CASE DISMISSED - BEFORE HEARING; VER: N; P
Judge: BOYER, BRUCE |
|
May 10, 2005 | Docket Event |
DISCHARGE OF LIS PENDENS Comment: DISCHARGE OF LIS PENDENS OR14308PG2658-001; VER: F; P Vol./Book 14308, Page 2658, 001 pages
Judge: BOYER, BRUCE |
|
May 09, 2005 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Comment: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM; VER: F; P
Judge: BOYER, BRUCE |
|
May 03, 2005 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS - NOT SERVED Comment: SUMMONS RETD NOT SERVED ANY UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS IN POSSESSION; VER: F; K
Judge: BOYER, BRUCE |
|
May 03, 2005 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS - SERVED Comment: SUMMONS RETD SERVED JOSEPH L STEPHENSON 042805; VER: F; K
Judge: BOYER, BRUCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.