Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Lincoln Shores Apartments Investors Llc, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by Jeffrey D Murphy, against Bassano, Cindy J, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with FULLERTON, WALTER presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFULLERTON, WALTER Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 28, 2005 |
CategoryDelinquent Tenant - County |
Last RefreshedSeptember 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
REQUESTED COPY SENT VIA Doc # 4 EMAIL
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
September 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE Doc # 2 FROM CLERK DESTROYED FILE LETTER
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
September 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR COPIES Doc # 1 ONLINE ORDER 84153 - VOIDED
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
September 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR COPIES Doc # 3 ONLINE ORDER 84167
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
November 23, 2011 | Docket Event |
ORDER RE DEPOSIT UNCLAIMED REGISTRY FUNDS UNDER F.S.43.19 Comment: ORDER RE: DEPOSIT OF UNCLAIMED FUNDS $569.75; VER: F; C
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
April 04, 2007 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR COPIES Comment: REQUEST FOR COPIES DONE 4/5/07 DJD; VER: N; K
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
March 30, 2007 | Docket Event |
ORDER GRANTING Comment: ORDER GRANTING DISMISSAL OR15716PG2064-002; VER: F; P Vol./Book 15716, Page 2064, 002 pages
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
March 27, 2007 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR Comment: REQUEST FOR: PAGE COUNT DONE 3/30/07 DJD (93PGS); VER: N; K
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
March 22, 2007 | Docket Event |
ORDER GRANTING Comment: ORDER GRANTING ATTY MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL; VER: F; D
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
March 05, 2007 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING Comment: NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC HEARING 031907 10:15; VER: F; D
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.