Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Childs, Derrick R, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Childs, Kathryn A, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with NEWTON, BONNIE S presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeNEWTON, BONNIE S Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 28, 2005 |
CategoryDissolution Of Marriage |
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 30, 2005 | Docket Event |
CERTIFIED STATEMENT COMPLETED BY CLERK Comment: CERTIFIED STATEMENT COMPLETED BY CLERK; VER: N; K
Judge: NEWTON, BONNIE S |
|
June 10, 2005 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT JUDGMENT (SRS DISPO) Comment: DEFAULT JUDGMENT; VER: N; P
Judge: NEWTON, BONNIE S |
|
June 10, 2005 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT Comment: FINAL JUDGMENT OR14378PG2129-001; VER: F; P Vol./Book 14378, Page 2129, 001 pages
Judge: NEWTON, BONNIE S |
|
June 10, 2005 | Docket Event |
RECOMMENDATION OF GENERAL MAGISTRATE Comment: REPORT/RECOMMEND OF GENER. MAGISTRATE; VER: F; P
Judge: NEWTON, BONNIE S |
|
May 20, 2005 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE Comment: CORRESPONDENCE DIVORCE; VER: F; D
Judge: NEWTON, BONNIE S |
|
May 12, 2005 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING Comment: NOTICE OF HEARING 051705 1:00 PRO SE; VER: F; P
Judge: NEWTON, BONNIE S |
|
April 25, 2005 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF REFERENCE TO GENERAL MAGISTRATE Comment: ORDER OF REFERENCE TO GENERAL MASTER; VER: F; P
Judge: NEWTON, BONNIE S |
|
April 22, 2005 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT ENTERED Comment: DEFAULT ENTERED /; VER: N; K
Judge: NEWTON, BONNIE S |
|
April 22, 2005 | Docket Event |
TEXT Comment: OATH OF WITNESS - FEE PAID $3.00; VER: N; A
Judge: NEWTON, BONNIE S |
|
April 22, 2005 | Docket Event |
TEXT Comment: KATHRYN A CHILDS; VER: F; K
Judge: NEWTON, BONNIE S |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.