Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Bevis, Karen Diane, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Eversole, James Philip, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with KHOUZAM, NELLY N presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKHOUZAM, NELLY N Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 28, 2005 |
CategoryDomestic Violence Injunction With Kids |
Last RefreshedJanuary 24, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 25, 2005 | Docket Event |
HEARING (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer KHOUZAM, NELLY N)
Judge: KHOUZAM, NELLY N |
|
March 14, 2005 | Docket Event |
CC TEMPORARY INJUNCTION WITHOUT NOTICE RETD Comment: C/C TEMPORARY INJUNCTION W/O NOTICE RETD NOT SERVED; VER: F; K
Judge: KHOUZAM, NELLY N |
|
March 11, 2005 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Comment: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM; VER: F; K
Judge: KHOUZAM, NELLY N |
|
March 11, 2005 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF INJUNCTION Comment: ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF INJUNCTION OR14172PG2159-001; VER: F; P Vol./Book 14172, Page 2159, 001 pages
Judge: KHOUZAM, NELLY N |
|
March 10, 2005 | Docket Event |
HEARING (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer KHOUZAM, NELLY N)
Judge: KHOUZAM, NELLY N |
|
February 28, 2005 | Docket Event |
CASE CALENDARED FOR Comment: CASE CALENDARED FOR 031005 09:00; VER: N; P
Judge: KHOUZAM, NELLY N |
|
February 28, 2005 | Docket Event |
CC PETITION WITH ATTACHMENTS TO SHF Comment: 3 C/C PETITION W/ATTACHMENTS TO SHF; VER: N; K
Judge: KHOUZAM, NELLY N |
|
February 28, 2005 | Docket Event |
TEMPORARY INJUNCTION WITHOUT NOTICE Comment: TEMPORARY INJUNCTION W/O NOTICE 031005; VER: F; P
Judge: KHOUZAM, NELLY N |
|
February 28, 2005 | Docket Event |
CASE FILED
Judge: KHOUZAM, NELLY N |
|
February 28, 2005 | Docket Event |
THIS CASE ASSIGNED BY CLERK TO SECTION Comment: THIS CASE ASSIGNED BY CLERK TO SECTION 023 BY 3070 - RANDOM FD; VER: N; P
Judge: KHOUZAM, NELLY N |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.