Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
St Joe Title Services Inc, filed a(n) Interpleader - County case represented by Lisa S Delvecchio, against Schalasky, Marilyn, Porto, Geraldine, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHESSINGER, KATHLEEN T Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 28, 2005 |
CategoryInterpleader - County |
Last RefreshedOctober 25, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 26, 2005 | Docket Event |
ORDER GRANTING Comment: ORDER GRANTING JUDGMENT ON PLEADINGS OR14275PG1329-002; VER: F; P Vol./Book 14275, Page 1329, 002 pages
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
April 26, 2005 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT (SRS) Comment: JUDGMENT; VER: N; P
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
April 26, 2005 | Docket Event |
ATTORNEY COVER LETTER Comment: ATTORNEY COVER LETTER; VER: F; P
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
April 19, 2005 | Docket Event |
COURT WORKSHEET Comment: COURT WORKSHEET; VER: F; P
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
March 30, 2005 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING Comment: NOTICE OF HEARING 041905 9:30; VER: F; P
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
March 23, 2005 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION Comment: MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON PLEADINGS; VER: F; P
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
March 21, 2005 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING Comment: NOTICE OF FILING ANSWERS (2) TO COMPLAINT PRO SE; VER: F; P
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
March 21, 2005 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF MAILING Comment: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; VER: F; K
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
March 18, 2005 | Docket Event |
ANSWER OF Comment: ANSWER OF: GERALDINE PORTO PRO SE; VER: F; D
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
March 18, 2005 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF MAILING Comment: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; VER: F; K
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.