Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Stanley Erskine, against Johnson, Philip R, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with JAGGER, EDWIN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJAGGER, EDWIN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 28, 2005 |
CategoryContracts And Indebtedness - County |
Last RefreshedOctober 27, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 27, 2013 | Docket Event |
REOPEN - CLOSED
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
September 30, 2008 | Docket Event |
Recording Of Satisfaction - Fee Paid $ Comment: RECORDING OF SATISFACTION - FEE PAID $10.00; VER: N; P
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
September 29, 2008 | Docket Event |
SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT Comment: SATISFACTION OF JUDGEMENT OR16392PG0566-001; VER: R; P Vol./Book 16392, Page 0566, 001 pages
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
May 28, 2008 | Docket Event |
OFFER OF SETTLEMENT Comment: OFFER TO PAY LESS THAN FULL AMOUNT DUE; VER: F; P
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
September 07, 2007 | Docket Event |
Recording Of Judgment Lien - Fee Paid $ Comment: RECORDING OF JDMT LIEN - FEE PAID $10.00; VER: N; P
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
September 05, 2007 | Docket Event |
PRAECIPE FOR RECORDATION OF JDMT AS LIEN Comment: PRAECIPE FOR RECORDATION OF JDMT AS LIEN; VER: F; P
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
August 21, 2007 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE FROM CLERK RE Comment: CORRESPONDENCE FROM CLERK RE: RTD SHF CKS; VER: F; K
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
August 17, 2007 | Docket Event |
PRAECIPE FOR RECORDATION OF JDMT AS LIEN Comment: PRAECIPE FOR RECORDATION OF JDMT AS LIEN; VER: F; P
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
June 01, 2006 | Docket Event |
ORDER Comment: C/C ORDER/CONTEMPT MLD/ATTY (LE); VER: N; K
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
May 31, 2006 | Docket Event |
ORDER Comment: ORDER CONTEMPT AND SUPP JUDGMENT; VER: F; P
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.