Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Rsg Family Limited Partnership-Florida, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by John E Mcmillan, Esq, against Wright, Melvin D, Thompson, Stephanie D, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with FULLERTON, WALTER presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFULLERTON, WALTER Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 28, 2005 |
CategoryDelinquent Tenant - County |
Last RefreshedJanuary 06, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 18, 2005 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION Comment: WRIT OF POSSESSION MAILED TO ATTORNEY; VER: N; K
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
March 17, 2005 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT Comment: JUDGMENT OF EVICTION; VER: F; P
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
March 17, 2005 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT JUDGMENT (SRS DISPO) Comment: DEFAULT JUDGMENT; VER: N; P
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
March 16, 2005 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT ENTERED Comment: DEFAULT ENTERED MELVIN D WRIGHT AND; VER: N; K
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
March 16, 2005 | Docket Event |
ID NAME Comment: STEPHANIE D THOMPSON COUNT I; VER: F; K
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
March 11, 2005 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT Comment: MOTION FOR DEFAULT COUNT 1/ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION; VER: F; P
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
March 11, 2005 | Docket Event |
VERIFICATION OF CLAIM AND NON-MILITARY SERVICE Comment: VERIFIC. OF CLAIM AND NON-MILITARY SERV; VER: F; P
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
March 11, 2005 | Docket Event |
PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION Comment: MOTION WRIT OF POSSESSION; VER: F; P
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
March 02, 2005 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS SERVED - POSTED Comment: SUMMONS RETD SERVED/POSTED MELVIN D WRIGHT 030105; VER: F; K
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
March 02, 2005 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS SERVED - POSTED Comment: SUMMONS RETD SERVED/POSTED STEPHANIE D THOMPSON 030105; VER: F; K
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.