Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Kelley, Thomas Frank, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Thomas R Omalley, against Cahoon, Larry W, represented by Adam C Shelton, Esq, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with SCHAEFER, JOHN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSCHAEFER, JOHN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 28, 2005 |
CategoryAuto Negligence - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 17, 2007 | Docket Event |
ATTORNEY COVER LETTER Comment: ATTORNEY COVER LETTER RECD BY COURT 091407; VER: F; D
Judge: SCHAEFER, JOHN A |
|
September 17, 2007 | Docket Event |
RECORDED AT Comment: RECORDED AT: OR15982PG0389-001; VER: N; D Vol./Book 15982, Page 0389, 001 pages
Judge: SCHAEFER, JOHN A |
|
September 17, 2007 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) Comment: CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING; VER: N; D
Judge: SCHAEFER, JOHN A |
|
September 17, 2007 | Docket Event |
JOINT STIP-ORDER Comment: JOINT STIP/ORDER OF DISMISSAL W/PREJUDICE; VER: F; D
Judge: SCHAEFER, JOHN A |
|
August 10, 2007 | Docket Event |
SUBPOENA Comment: SUBPOENA NOT SERVED; VER: F; P
Judge: SCHAEFER, JOHN A |
|
August 09, 2007 | Docket Event |
SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM WITHOUT DEPO Comment: SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM W/O DEPO SERVED -2; VER: F; D
Judge: SCHAEFER, JOHN A |
|
August 07, 2007 | Docket Event |
SUBPOENA Comment: SUBPOENA SERVED; VER: F; P
Judge: SCHAEFER, JOHN A |
|
August 06, 2007 | Docket Event |
MEMORANDUM OF LAW Comment: MEMORANDUM OF LAW AND MOTION SUBMIT MEDICAL BILLS TO JURY; VER: F; P
Judge: SCHAEFER, JOHN A |
|
August 02, 2007 | Docket Event |
SUBPOENA Comment: SUBPOENA SERVED; VER: F; P
Judge: SCHAEFER, JOHN A |
|
July 31, 2007 | Docket Event |
ATTORNEY COVER LETTER Comment: ATTORNEY COVER LETTER RECD BY COURT 072707; VER: F; P
Judge: SCHAEFER, JOHN A |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.