Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
U S Bank Na Trustee, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Robert S Kahane, against Bowman, Ava, Gray, Shyla, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with CASE, JAMES R presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCASE, JAMES R Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 01, 1900 |
CategoryMortgage Foreclosure - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 23, 2005 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF TITLE Comment: CERTIFICATE OF TITLE MLD TO TAMMY SPENCER; VER: F; K
Judge: CASE, JAMES R |
|
June 10, 2005 | Docket Event |
AS TO: Comment: FOR: AVAILABLE PROCEEDS; VER: N; A
Judge: CASE, JAMES R |
|
June 10, 2005 | Docket Event |
TEXT Comment: COURT REGISTRY CHECK NUMBER: 623857 $41094.21; VER: N; A
Judge: CASE, JAMES R |
|
June 10, 2005 | Docket Event |
AS TO: Comment: TO: US BANK NATIONAL %KAHANE & ASSOCIATES PA; VER: N; A
Judge: CASE, JAMES R |
|
June 09, 2005 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS Comment: CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS; VER: F; K
Judge: CASE, JAMES R |
|
June 07, 2005 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF TITLE Comment: CERTIFICATE OF TITLE RECORDED: OR14365PG1705-001; VER: R; K Vol./Book 14365, Page 1705, 001 pages
Judge: CASE, JAMES R |
|
June 06, 2005 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT Comment: AFFIDAVIT OF ADDITIONAL ADVANCES; VER: F; P
Judge: CASE, JAMES R |
|
June 01, 2005 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF SALE Comment: CERTIFICATE OF SALE TAMMY B SPENCER; VER: F; K
Judge: CASE, JAMES R |
|
June 01, 2005 | Docket Event |
PUBLISHER'S AFFIDAVIT NOTICE OF SALE Comment: PUBLISHERS AFFIDAVIT NOTICE OF SALE; VER: F; P
Judge: CASE, JAMES R |
|
May 31, 2005 | Docket Event |
Doc Stamps - Fee Paid $ Comment: DOC STAMPS - FEE PAID $287.70; VER: N; P
Judge: CASE, JAMES R |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.