Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Pancake Alberta, filed a(n) General Negligence - Torts case represented by Christopher R Pavlik, against Piechocki, Regina, Piechocki, Jeffery, represented by Matthew C Scarborough, Esq, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with FARNELL, CROCKETT presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFARNELL, CROCKETT Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 28, 2005 |
CategoryNegligence - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Negligence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 07, 2005 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Comment: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM; VER: F; P
Judge: FARNELL, CROCKETT |
|
June 06, 2005 | Docket Event |
COPY CORRESPONDENCE RE Comment: COPY CORRESPONDENCE RE: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; VER: F; D
Judge: FARNELL, CROCKETT |
|
May 26, 2005 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - BEFORE HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) Comment: CASE DISMISSED - BEFORE HEARING; VER: N; P
Judge: FARNELL, CROCKETT |
|
May 26, 2005 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Comment: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/OUT PREJUDICE; VER: F; P
Judge: FARNELL, CROCKETT |
|
April 11, 2005 | Docket Event |
REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES Comment: AMENDED REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; VER: F; P
Judge: FARNELL, CROCKETT |
|
March 15, 2005 | Docket Event |
AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPO Comment: AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPO REGINA/JEFFREY PIECHOCKI; VER: F; P
Judge: FARNELL, CROCKETT |
|
March 15, 2005 | Docket Event |
REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES Comment: REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; VER: F; P
Judge: FARNELL, CROCKETT |
|
March 14, 2005 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION Comment: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; VER: F; D
Judge: FARNELL, CROCKETT |
|
March 11, 2005 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION Comment: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; VER: F; P
Judge: FARNELL, CROCKETT |
|
March 10, 2005 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION Comment: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; VER: F; D
Judge: FARNELL, CROCKETT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.