Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Panici, John, filed a(n) Injunction - Circuit case against Weaver Joel R Attorney, Tankel Robert L Attorney, Reimer, Linda L, Milo Michael A Moctezuma Attorney, Dollar Lake Village Condominium Ii Association Inc, (total of 5) See All represented by Giorgio Vallar, Daniel A Harris, Esq, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with BAIRD, W presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBAIRD, W Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 28, 2005 |
CategoryInjunction - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 18, 2006 | Docket Event |
FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE Comment: FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OR15433PG0101-002; VER: F; D Vol./Book 15433, Page 0101, 002 pages
Judge: BAIRD, W DOUGLAS |
|
October 18, 2006 | Docket Event |
ATTORNEY COVER LETTER Comment: ATTORNEY COVER LETTER RECD BY COURT 101806; VER: F; D
Judge: BAIRD, W DOUGLAS |
|
August 23, 2006 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING Comment: NOTICE OF FILING ATTD COPY CERTIFIED MAIL RETURN RECEIPT(2); VER: F; D
Judge: BAIRD, W DOUGLAS |
|
August 22, 2006 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING Comment: NOTICE OF FILING ATTD CERTIFIED MAIL RETURN RECEIPT; VER: F; D
Judge: BAIRD, W DOUGLAS |
|
August 14, 2006 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR COPIES Comment: REQUEST FOR COPIES; VER: N; K
Judge: BAIRD, W DOUGLAS |
|
July 27, 2006 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING Comment: NOTICE OF HEARING 082206 9:00; VER: F; D
Judge: BAIRD, W DOUGLAS |
|
July 27, 2006 | Docket Event |
DEF-RESP'S MOTION TO DISMISS Comment: MOTION DISMISS AND NOTICE OF NON-RECORD ACTIVITY; VER: F; D
Judge: BAIRD, W DOUGLAS |
|
July 18, 2006 | Docket Event |
DEF-RESP'S MOTION TO DISMISS Comment: MOTION DISMISS; VER: F; D
Judge: BAIRD, W DOUGLAS |
|
July 18, 2006 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING Comment: NOTICE OF HEARING 082206 9:00; VER: F; D
Judge: BAIRD, W DOUGLAS |
|
February 21, 2006 | Docket Event |
MANDATE PER CURIAM AFFIRMED Comment: MANDATE PER CURIUM AFFIRMED; VER: F; P
Judge: BAIRD, W DOUGLAS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.