Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Winters, Carlyle, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Guy N Perenich, against Allstate Floridian Insurance Company, represented by David W Molhem, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with RONDOLINO, ANTHONY presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRONDOLINO, ANTHONY Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 25, 2005 |
CategoryContracts And Indebtedness - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 18, 2008 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE EXPERT INTERROGATORIES Comment: NOTICE OF SERVICE EXPERT INTERROGATORIES (THIRD); VER: F; D
Judge: RONDOLINO, ANTHONY |
|
May 07, 2008 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY Comment: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION OF NON-PARTY 050508; VER: F; D
Judge: RONDOLINO, ANTHONY |
|
January 08, 2007 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY Comment: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION OF NON-PARTY 010307 (2); VER: F; D
Judge: RONDOLINO, ANTHONY |
|
October 31, 2005 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR COPIES Comment: REQUEST FOR PAGE COUNT; VER: N; K
Judge: RONDOLINO, ANTHONY |
|
September 22, 2005 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR COPIES Comment: REQUEST FOR COPIES - FAXED 092305; VER: N; K
Judge: RONDOLINO, ANTHONY |
|
June 22, 2005 | Docket Event |
(((((FILE VERIFIED TO THIS DATE))))) Comment: (((((FILE VERIFIED/SEALED THIS DATE))))) FRC; VER: N; P
Judge: RONDOLINO, ANTHONY |
|
June 20, 2005 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS Comment: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; VER: F; D
Judge: RONDOLINO, ANTHONY |
|
June 20, 2005 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION Comment: RESPONSE TO FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; VER: F; D
Judge: RONDOLINO, ANTHONY |
|
June 20, 2005 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES Comment: NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES; VER: F; D
Judge: RONDOLINO, ANTHONY |
|
June 17, 2005 | Docket Event |
AVOIDANCE OF AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES Comment: AVOIDANCE AND RESPONSE TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; VER: F; P
Judge: RONDOLINO, ANTHONY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.