Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Charles Rutenberg Realty Inc, filed a(n) Declaratory - Circuit case represented by Tara M Oconnor, against First In Real Estate Corporate Center Inc, represented by Martin A Pedata, Esq, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with CASE, JAMES presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCASE, JAMES Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 25, 2005 |
CategoryDeclaratory - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 25, 2006 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) Comment: CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING; VER: N; P
Judge: CASE, JAMES R |
|
May 25, 2006 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Comment: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; VER: N; P
Judge: CASE, JAMES R |
|
May 25, 2006 | Docket Event |
WITHOUT PREJUDICE Comment: WITHOUT PREJUDICE; VER: F; P
Judge: CASE, JAMES R |
|
November 15, 2005 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION-ORDER Comment: STIPULATION/ORDER FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL; VER: F; P
Judge: CASE, JAMES R |
|
October 06, 2005 | Docket Event |
COPY Comment: COPY CORRESPONDENCE BETWEEN ATTORNEYS; VER: F; D
Judge: CASE, JAMES R |
|
October 04, 2005 | Docket Event |
SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM WITHOUT DEPO Comment: SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM W/O DEPO RETD SERVED; VER: F; P
Judge: CASE, JAMES R |
|
September 30, 2005 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES Comment: AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; VER: F; D
Judge: CASE, JAMES R |
|
September 30, 2005 | Docket Event |
ANSWER OF Comment: ANSWER OF: FIRST IN REAL ESTATE CORPORATE CENTER INC AND; VER: N; D
Judge: CASE, JAMES R |
|
September 12, 2005 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION Comment: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; VER: F; P
Judge: CASE, JAMES R |
|
September 12, 2005 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY Comment: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION OF NON-PARTY 090705; VER: F; P
Judge: CASE, JAMES R |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.