Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Ransom, Donald Cjr, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Andrew J Rodnite, Jr, against Benton Express Inc, Baker, Sylvester J, represented by Tod B Eikner, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with CASE, JAMES presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCASE, JAMES Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 25, 2005 |
CategoryAuto Negligence - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 13, 2006 | Docket Event |
FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE Comment: FINAL ORDER DISMISSAL W/PREJUDICE OR14931PG1793-001; VER: F; P Vol./Book 14931, Page 1793, 001 pages
Judge: CASE, JAMES R |
|
February 13, 2006 | Docket Event |
ATTORNEY COVER LETTER Comment: ATTORNEY COVER LETTER RCVD BY COURT 020906; VER: F; P
Judge: CASE, JAMES R |
|
February 13, 2006 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) Comment: CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING; VER: N; P
Judge: CASE, JAMES R |
|
February 13, 2006 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION Comment: STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE; VER: F; P
Judge: CASE, JAMES R |
|
February 10, 2006 | Docket Event |
NOTICE Comment: NOTICE OF SATISFACTION OF WORKER'S COMPENSATION LIEN; VER: F; P
Judge: CASE, JAMES R |
|
January 20, 2006 | Docket Event |
TEXT Comment: NOTICE FINAL DISPOSITION OF REFERRAL - SETTLED; VER: F; P
Judge: CASE, JAMES R |
|
January 12, 2006 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE Comment: RESPONSE FOR COPIES; VER: F; D
Judge: CASE, JAMES R |
|
November 18, 2005 | Docket Event |
ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME Comment: ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME FOR MEDIATION UNTIL 020306; VER: F; P
Judge: CASE, JAMES R |
|
November 18, 2005 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE Comment: NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE 020306 12:00; VER: F; P
Judge: CASE, JAMES R |
|
November 15, 2005 | Docket Event |
NOTICE Comment: NOTICE PAYMENT COMPENSATION BENEFITS AND MEDICAL BENEFITS; VER: F; P
Judge: CASE, JAMES R |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.