Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Nc Two Lp, Brown Bark Ii Lp, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Richard B Storfer, against Brannon, Lawrence D, Brannon, Deborah J, represented by David L Schrader, Esq, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with SHAMES, MARK I presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSHAMES, MARK I Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 25, 2005 |
CategoryContracts And Indebtedness - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 14, 2013 | Docket Event |
SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT
Judge: SHAMES, MARK I |
|
December 12, 2012 | Docket Event |
ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY
Judge: SHAMES, MARK I |
|
November 19, 2012 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING 12/04/12 2:00
Judge: SHAMES, MARK I |
|
November 19, 2012 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY
Judge: SHAMES, MARK I |
|
November 09, 2012 | Docket Event |
DEF-RESP'S MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY
Judge: SHAMES, MARK I |
|
November 09, 2012 | Docket Event |
CASE REOPENED
Judge: SHAMES, MARK I |
|
September 24, 2012 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION (re)
Judge: SHAMES, MARK I |
|
June 29, 2012 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION Comment: RE-NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; VER: F; P
Judge: SHAMES, MARK I |
|
May 17, 2012 | Docket Event |
SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM FOR DEPOSITION Comment: SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM FOR DEPO SERVED (2); VER: F; P
Judge: SHAMES, MARK I |
|
April 19, 2012 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION Comment: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; VER: F; P
Judge: SHAMES, MARK I |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.