Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Federal National Mortgage Association, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Joseph N Dayan, against Florida State Of Department Of Revenue, Mortgage Electroni Registration Systems Inc, Pacific Shore Funding, Wrazen, Olga, represented by Diana B Matson, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with RONDOLINO, ANTHONY presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRONDOLINO, ANTHONY Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 24, 2005 |
CategoryMortgage Foreclosure - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 20, 2013 | Docket Event |
REOPEN - CLOSED
Judge: RONDOLINO, ANTHONY |
|
December 06, 2010 | Docket Event |
ORIGINAL LOAN DOCUMENTS Comment: RECEIPT OF ORIGINAL LOAN DOCUMENTS; VER: F; P
Judge: RONDOLINO, ANTHONY |
|
December 01, 2010 | Docket Event |
COPY OF RECEIPT-RETURNED ORIG NOTE & MTG Comment: COPY OF RECEIPT/RETURNED ORIG NOTE & MTG; VER: F; K
Judge: RONDOLINO, ANTHONY |
|
November 18, 2010 | Docket Event |
ORDER Comment: ORDER FOR CLERK TO RETURN ORIGINAL LOAN DOCUMENTS; VER: F; P
Judge: RONDOLINO, ANTHONY |
|
November 18, 2010 | Docket Event |
ATTORNEY COVER LETTER Comment: ATTORNEY COVER LETTER COURT RCVD 111710; VER: F; P
Judge: RONDOLINO, ANTHONY |
|
November 16, 2010 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Comment: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM; VER: F; P
Judge: RONDOLINO, ANTHONY |
|
November 16, 2010 | Docket Event |
DISCHARGE OF LIS PENDENS Comment: DISCHARGE OF LIS PENDENS OR17094PG1670-002; VER: F; P Vol./Book 17094, Page 1670, 002 pages
Judge: RONDOLINO, ANTHONY |
|
November 16, 2010 | Docket Event |
ORDER VACATING Comment: ORDER VACATING: JUDGMENT/DISMISSING AND; VER: N; P
Judge: RONDOLINO, ANTHONY |
|
November 16, 2010 | Docket Event |
ATTORNEY COVER LETTER Comment: ATTORNEY COVER LETTER RECVD BY COURT 111510; VER: F; P
Judge: RONDOLINO, ANTHONY |
|
November 10, 2010 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION Comment: MOTION FOR RETURN OF ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS; VER: F; P
Judge: RONDOLINO, ANTHONY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.