Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Asset Acceptance Llc, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by Rodolfo J Miro, against Macdonald, William K, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with GRUBE, KARL B presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGRUBE, KARL B Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 28, 2005 |
CategorySmall Claims |
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2022 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 15, 2005 | Docket Event |
THIS CASE ASSIGNED BY CLERK TO SECTION Comment: CASE ASSIGNED SECTION 044 FROM SECTION SPC BY 2082 - MANUAL S; VER: N; P
Judge: GRUBE, KARL B |
|
November 15, 2005 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Comment: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/O PREJUDICE; VER: F; P
Judge: GRUBE, KARL B |
|
November 15, 2005 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) Comment: CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING; VER: N; P
Judge: GRUBE, KARL B |
|
November 14, 2005 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISM MAILED TO PLTF(S) Comment: NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISM MAILED TO PLTF(S) (S)/PLTF(S) ATTY(S); VER: N; K
Judge: GRUBE, KARL B |
|
November 14, 2005 | Docket Event |
NOTICE INTENT DISM (LACK PROSECUTION) BY 000000 A Comment: NOTICE INTENT DISM (LACK PROSECUTION) BY: 121405 AS FOLLOWS:; VER: N; K
Judge: GRUBE, KARL B |
|
November 14, 2005 | Docket Event |
NOTICE INTENT DISM (LACK PROSECUTION) BY 000000 A Comment: MACDONALD WILLIAM K; VER: N; K
Judge: GRUBE, KARL B |
|
March 16, 2005 | Docket Event |
NO SERVICE LETTER MAILED Comment: NO SERVICE LETTER MAILED TO PLTF ATTY; VER: F; K
Judge: GRUBE, KARL B |
|
March 14, 2005 | Docket Event |
NOTICE TO APPEAR - SERVED Comment: NOTICE RETURNED NOT SERVED; VER: F; K
Judge: GRUBE, KARL B |
|
March 01, 2005 | Docket Event |
Small Claims Filing - Fee Paid Comment: SMALL CLAIMS FILING FEE PAID $255.00; VER: N; P
Judge: GRUBE, KARL B |
|
February 28, 2005 | Docket Event |
NOTICE-STMT OF CLAIM-DEFT Comment: NOTICE/STMT OF CLAIM-DEFT/ PS/HOFFMANS; VER: N; K
Judge: GRUBE, KARL B |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.