Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Asset Acceptance Llc, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by Jackie Wainio, against Walden, Lapierre, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with GRUBE, KARL B presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGRUBE, KARL B Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 28, 2005 |
CategorySmall Claims |
Last RefreshedJanuary 03, 2022 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 11, 2005 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION-ORDER APPROVING PAYMENT Comment: STIPULATION/ORDER APPROVING PAYMENT; VER: F; K
Judge: GRUBE, KARL B |
|
March 25, 2005 | Docket Event |
THIS CASE ASSIGNED BY CLERK TO SECTION Comment: CASE ASSIGNED SECTION 044 FROM SECTION 045 BY 5347 - MANUAL E; VER: N; P
Judge: GRUBE, KARL B |
|
March 23, 2005 | Docket Event |
SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL (2:00 PM) () Result: LEGACY MINUTES
Judge: GRUBE, KARL B |
|
March 23, 2005 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION Comment: STIPULATION FOR SETTLEMENT; VER: N; K
Judge: GRUBE, KARL B |
|
March 23, 2005 | Docket Event |
THIS CASE ASSIGNED BY CLERK TO SECTION Comment: CASE ASSIGNED SECTION 045 FROM SECTION SPC ICD; VER: N; P
Judge: GRUBE, KARL B |
|
March 14, 2005 | Docket Event |
NOTICE TO APPEAR - SERVED Comment: NOTICE RETURNED SERVED; VER: F; K
Judge: GRUBE, KARL B |
|
February 28, 2005 | Docket Event |
NOTICE TO PLTF-PLTF ATTY Comment: NOTICE TO PLTF ATTY/HRG 3/23 @ 2:00 J/GRUBE; VER: F; K
Judge: GRUBE, KARL B |
|
February 28, 2005 | Docket Event |
STATEMENT OF CLAIM Comment: STATEMENT OF CLAIM; VER: F; P
Judge: GRUBE, KARL B |
|
February 28, 2005 | Docket Event |
NOTICE-STMT OF CLAIM-DEFT Comment: NOTICE/STMT OF CLAIM-DEFT/ PS/HOFFMANS; VER: N; K
Judge: GRUBE, KARL B |
|
February 28, 2005 | Docket Event |
THIS CASE ASSIGNED BY CLERK TO SECTION Comment: THIS CASE ASSIGNED BY CLERK TO SECTION SPC BY 9983 - MANUAL SC; VER: N; P
Judge: GRUBE, KARL B |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.