Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Capital One Bank, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by Andrew D Fleisher, against Ledger, Michelle, Ledger, William S, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with VACCARO, DOROTHY presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeVACCARO, DOROTHY Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 28, 2005 |
CategorySmall Claims |
Last RefreshedOctober 22, 2022 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 02, 2007 | Docket Event |
Recording Of Satisfaction - Fee Paid $ Comment: RECORDING OF SATISFACTION - FEE PAID $10.00; VER: N; P
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
April 02, 2007 | Docket Event |
SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT Comment: SATISFACTION OF JUDGEMENT OR15719PG2456-001; VER: R; P Vol./Book 15719, Page 2456, 001 pages
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
February 14, 2007 | Docket Event |
SUBPOENA Comment: SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM (ALIAS)NOT SERVED; VER: F; P
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
December 26, 2006 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE Comment: CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES/; VER: N; P
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
December 26, 2006 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING Comment: NOTICE OF FILING ALIAS SUBPOENA FOR PRODUCTION; VER: F; P
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
December 26, 2006 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION Comment: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION AND REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; VER: F; P
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
December 05, 2006 | Docket Event |
SUBPOENA Comment: SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM FOR PRODUCTION NOT SERVED; VER: F; P
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
November 20, 2006 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE Comment: CERTIFICATE SERVICE INTERROGATORIES/REQUEST TO PRODUCE/; VER: N; P
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
November 20, 2006 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS Comment: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; VER: F; P
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
November 07, 2006 | Docket Event |
SUBPOENA Comment: SUBPOENA FOR PRODUCTION; VER: F; P
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.