Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Monogram Credit Card Bank Of Georgia, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by Andrew D Fleisher, against Aslan, Gabriel, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with BLACKWOOD, WILLIAM B, JR presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBLACKWOOD, WILLIAM B, JR Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 28, 2005 |
CategorySmall Claims |
Last RefreshedJanuary 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 27, 2005 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - BEFORE HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) Comment: CASE DISMISSED - BEFORE HEARING; VER: N; P
Judge: BLACKWOOD, WILLIAM B, JR |
|
June 27, 2005 | Docket Event |
THIS CASE ASSIGNED BY CLERK TO SECTION Comment: CASE ASSIGNED SECTION 048 FROM SECTION NPC BY 1798 - MANUAL S; VER: N; P
Judge: BLACKWOOD, WILLIAM B, JR |
|
June 27, 2005 | Docket Event |
VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Comment: VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/O PREJUDICE; VER: F; P
Judge: BLACKWOOD, WILLIAM B, JR |
|
April 11, 2005 | Docket Event |
NO SERVICE LETTER MAILED Comment: NO SERVICE LETTER MAILED TO PLTF ATTY; VER: F; K
Judge: BLACKWOOD, WILLIAM B, JR |
|
March 22, 2005 | Docket Event |
SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL (2:30 PM) () Result: LEGACY MINUTES
Judge: BLACKWOOD, WILLIAM B, JR |
|
March 22, 2005 | Docket Event |
PRE-TRIAL CONTINUED PEND SERVICE Comment: NOTICE PRE-TRIAL CONTINUED PEND SERVICE 041105; VER: F; K
Judge: BLACKWOOD, WILLIAM B, JR |
|
March 21, 2005 | Docket Event |
NOTICE TO APPEAR - SERVED Comment: NOTICE RETURNED NO SERVICE ATTACHED; VER: F; K
Judge: BLACKWOOD, WILLIAM B, JR |
|
March 21, 2005 | Docket Event |
NOTICE TO APPEAR - SERVED Comment: NOTICE RETURNED NOT SERVED; VER: F; K
Judge: BLACKWOOD, WILLIAM B, JR |
|
February 28, 2005 | Docket Event |
Small Claims Filing - Fee Paid Comment: SMALL CLAIMS FILING FEE PAID $155.00; VER: N; P
Judge: BLACKWOOD, WILLIAM B, JR |
|
February 28, 2005 | Docket Event |
NOTICE TO PLTF-PLTF ATTY Comment: NOTICE TO PLTF ATTY/HRG 3/22 @ 2:30 J/BLACKWOOD; VER: F; K
Judge: BLACKWOOD, WILLIAM B, JR |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.